Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrose O’Callaghan, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1680¹Born
14 Sep 172949.7SelectedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
26 Sep 172949.7ConfirmedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
9 Oct 172949.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
13 Aug 174464.6DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambrose O’Callaghan
Bishop Ambrose O’Callaghan O.F.M. (born 1680, died ) Bishop of Ferns

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 200
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 37
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast