Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Antonelli

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1641BornVelletri
28 Dec 167231.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Dec 167231.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 170967.5AppointedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
17 Nov 171170.1DiedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Antonelli:
Bishop Antonio Antonelli (born , died ) Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado

  • a priest for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 86
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015