Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccolò Cardinal Caracciolo

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1658BornVilla Santa Maria
10 May 170041.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
6 Jun 170041.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
23 Apr 170344.5AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
16 Dec 171557.1Elevated to Cardinal
5 Feb 171657.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
7 Feb 172869.2DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Caracciolo:
Cardinal Niccolò Caracciolo (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
  • a cardinal for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1715

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013