Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicoḷ Cardinal Acciaioli

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1630BornFlorence, Italy
29 Nov 166939.4Elevated to Cardinal
19 May 167039.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
19 Oct 168959.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
28 Nov 168959.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
28 Sep 169363.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
8 Nov 169363.3Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
5 Dec 170070.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
18 Mar 171584.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
23 Feb 171988.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Nicoḷ Acciaioli:
Cardinal Nicoḷ Acciaioli (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
  • a cardinal for 49.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1669

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013