Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles Thomas Cardinal Maillard de Tournon

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1668Born
12 Jun 169526.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 170132.9AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
21 Dec 170133.0Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
1 Aug 170738.6Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jun 171041.4DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

MicroData Summary for Charles Thomas Maillard de Tournon (VIAF: 2461263)
Charles Thomas Cardinal Maillard de Tournon (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTurin, Italy

  • a priest for 14.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
  • a cardinal for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Aug 1707
  • c3+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast