Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Idelfonso Manara, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1653BornMediolanen
19 Dec 167623.2Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
7 Dec 171663.1AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
13 Dec 171663.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
21 Mar 172672.4DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Idelfonso Manara:
Bishop Idelfonso Manara B. (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 122
  • ob/c2: CB, 8 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014