Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi del Giudice, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1709Born
19 Sep 173324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Mar 177060.6AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
19 Mar 177060.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
1790¹80.4DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi del Giudice
Archbishop Luigi del Giudice O.S.B. (born , died 1790) Archbishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChieti

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast