Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bonaventura Prestandrea, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Tamiathis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1705Born
20 Nov 176964.0AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
30 Nov 176964.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
18 Dec 176964.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
12 Dec 177772.1DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Prestandrea
Archbishop Bonaventura Prestandrea O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Lipari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 192, and Page 263
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast