Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthieu François Antoine Philippe Guasco, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sagone (Sagona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1720BornBastia
26 Oct 174423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
6 Aug 177049.7AppointedBishop of Nebbio, France
12 Aug 177049.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nebbio, France
18 Oct 177251.9SelectedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
8 Mar 177352.2ConfirmedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
Oct 1801³80.8ResignedBishop of Sagone (Sagona), France
24 Jul 180281.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Sagone (Sagona), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthieu François Antoine Philippe Guasco:
Bishop Matthieu François Antoine Philippe Guasco O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sagone (Sagona)

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 305, and Page 362
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015