Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio D’Afflitto, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1717Born
1733¹15.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
11 Jun 174124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
20 Aug 176447.2AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
26 Aug 176447.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
26 Oct 177255.4DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio D’Afflitto
Archbishop Antonio D’Afflitto C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLizzanello

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 190
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018