Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco de Lauria

Deceased

Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1740Born
22 Dec 176424.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 177535.7AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
26 Nov 177535.7Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
1796¹55.8DiedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco de Lauria
Bishop Francesco de Lauria (born , died 1796) Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCassano

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 231
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,775, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast