Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Filipponi Tenderini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Anagni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1726Born
4 Jun 175730.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 176639.8AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
19 May 176639.9Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
11 Sep 177852.2ResignedBishop of Anagni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Filipponi Tenderini
Bishop Giovanni Battista Filipponi Tenderini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Anagni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTermi

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 81
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,766, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast