Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcantonio Cardinal Marcolini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1721³BornFano, Italy
27 Apr 175432.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
Feb 1760³38.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
27 Feb 176846.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 176947.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
25 Jun 176947.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
19 Aug 176947.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
Feb 1771³49.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
23 Jun 177755.5Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jul 177755.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
18 Jun 178260.5DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Marcolini (VIAF: 89090365)
Marcantonio Cardinal Marcolini (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio

  • a priest for 14.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
  • a cardinal for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1777
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 404
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 8 Nov 2016