Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Ahern Torpie

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cairns


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1910BornGympie
25 Nov 193424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
14 Sep 196757.1AppointedBishop of Cairns, Australia
30 Nov 196757.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cairns, Australia
13 Dec 196757.4InstalledBishop of Cairns, Australia
5 Aug 198575.0RetiredBishop of Cairns, Australia
30 Dec 200090.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Cairns, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Ahern Torpie:
Bishop John Ahern Torpie (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cairns

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013