Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Alexius Bathersby

Archbishop Emeritus of Brisbane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1936 BornStanthorpe
30 Jun 196124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Toowoomba, Australia
17 Jan 198649.5AppointedBishop of Cairns, Australia
20 Mar 198649.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cairns, Australia
3 Dec 199155.4AppointedArchbishop of Brisbane, Australia
30 Jan 199255.5InstalledArchbishop of Brisbane, Australia
14 Nov 201175.3RetiredArchbishop of Brisbane, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Alexius Bathersby:
Archbishop John Alexius Bathersby (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Brisbane

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Brisbane.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 28 Mar 2014