Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brian Vincent Finnigan

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brisbane

Titular Bishop of Rapidum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1938 BornPort Fairy
23 May 197031.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ballarat, Australia
31 Jan 200263.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brisbane, Australia
31 Jan 200263.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Rapidum
8 Apr 200263.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rapidum
2 May 201172.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Toowoomba, Australia
11 Jul 201273.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Toowoomba, Australia
30 Dec 201577.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brisbane, Australia

MicroData Summary for Brian Vincent Finnigan:
Bishop Brian Vincent Finnigan (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brisbane

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Brisbane.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,171
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015