Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph John Oudeman, O.F.M. Cap.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brisbane, Australia

Titular Bishop of Respecta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1942 Born
7 Dec 196220.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jun 196624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
30 Nov 200260.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brisbane, Australia
30 Nov 200260.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Respecta
11 Feb 200360.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Respecta
28 Mar 201775.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brisbane, Australia

MicroData Summary for Joseph John Oudeman
Bishop Joseph John Oudeman O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brisbane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBreda, Diocese of Breda, Netherlands

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Brisbane.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,327
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017