Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Foley

Bishop of Cairns, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1948 Born
7 Aug 197325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brisbane, Australia
16 Jul 199243.9AppointedBishop of Cairns, Australia
21 Aug 199244.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cairns, Australia

MicroData Summary for James Foley
Bishop James Foley (born ) Bishop of Cairns

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrisbane

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cairns.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,789

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast