Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Alotau-Sideia

Dioecesis Alotaunus-Sideianus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Rolando Crisostomo Santos, C.M., Bishop
  • Desmond Charles Moore, M.S.C., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 28 April 1975
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Port Moresby
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Papua New Guinea
  • Square Kilometers: 20,000 (7,725 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 105, Alotau, Milne Bay Province 211, Papua New Guinea
  • Telephone: 641.13.54
  • Fax: 641.13.25

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Samarai
13 June 1946ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Papua Prefecture Apostolic of Samarai (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Samarai
11 November 1956ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Samarai Vicariate Apostolic of Samarai
Diocese of Sideia
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Samarai Diocese of Sideia
Diocese of Alotau-Sideia
28 April 1975Name ChangedDiocese of Sideia Diocese of Alotau-Sideia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Sideia
1970104,000.0%21210372210ap1971
Diocese of Alotau-Sideia
198013,100113,00011.6%118196892724ap1981
199022,342132,94316.8%118191,175283930ap1991
199929,132176,51916.5%116171,7131243222ap2000
200029,642176,51916.8%117181,646263421ap2001
200130,450180,00016.9%218201,5221312821ap2002
200238,639209,05418.5%218201,9311283622ap2003
200333,260212,40015.7%219211,5831293622ap2004
200434,462217,00015.9%218201,7231263514ap2005
200637,153225,00016.5%220221,6881254016ap2007
201243,845257,00017.1%713202,1921183817ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013