Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Steven Satterthwaite

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lismore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1928BornRandwick
16 Mar 195728.5Ordained PriestPriest of Armidale, Australia
6 Mar 196940.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lismore, Australia
6 Mar 196940.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thignica
1 May 196940.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thignica
1 Sep 197143.0SucceededBishop of Lismore, Australia
1 Dec 200173.3ResignedBishop of Lismore, Australia
23 Apr 201687.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Lismore, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Steven Satterthwaite
Bishop John Steven Satterthwaite (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lismore

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 46.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • d: CB, 25 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 May 2016