Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frumencio Escudero Arenas

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puyo, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Cincari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1947 Born
15 Aug 198537.8Ordained PriestPriest of Puyo, Ecuador
6 Oct 199244.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Puyo, Ecuador
6 Oct 199244.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cincari
29 Nov 199245.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cincari
25 Jul 199850.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Puyo, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Frumencio Escudero Arenas
Bishop Frumencio Escudero Arenas (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCelada del Camino, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Puyo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,989
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018