Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Sebastião (Sebastián) Acosta Hurtado, O.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Canelos, Ecuador


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Dec 1921Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Nov 1948AppointedPrefect of Canelos, Ecuador
1958¹ResignedPrefect of Canelos, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastião (Sebastián) Acosta Hurtado
Father Sebastião (Sebastián) Acosta Hurtado O.P. , Prefect Emeritus of Canelos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 22 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Mar 2019

Quantcast