Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antonio de Rojas Manrique

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies, Spain

Bishop of Burgos


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1496AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
22 Dec 1507AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
11 May 1524AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
11 May 1524AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
3 Jul 1525AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
27 Jun 1527DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Rojas Manrique
Patriarch Antonio de Rojas Manrique (died ) Patriarch of West Indies

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 184
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 143, and Page 233
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 204, and Page 267
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast