Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Valdivieso, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1495¹Born
29 Feb 154449.1AppointedBishop of Nicaragua
8 Nov 154550.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nicaragua
26 Feb 154954.1DiedBishop of Nicaragua

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Valdivieso (VIAF: 114203)
Bishop Antonio de Valdivieso O.P. (born 1495, died ) Bishop of Nicaragua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla Hermosa, Diocese of Burgos, Spain
Ordained BishopDiocese of Nicaragua
Death PlaceLeón, Diocese of Nicaragua

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,797
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,290
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 56, Number 306
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 257
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 16 Sep 2017