Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ochoa Salazar

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Sep 1577AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
7 Aug 1587AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
9 Mar 1594DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Ochoa Salazar (VIAF: 87989846)
Bishop Juan Ochoa Salazar (died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martín de Don, Diocese of Burgos

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 88, Number 541
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 145, and Page 275
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1577, Number 30*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast