Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Tobar Gonzáles, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cuttack, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1896Born
10 Jul 192125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
10 Mar 194953.0AppointedBishop of Cuttack, India
29 Jun 194953.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cuttack, India
18 Apr 197175.1DiedBishop of Cuttack, India

MicroData Summary for Pablo Tobar Gonzáles
Bishop Pablo Tobar Gonzáles C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Cuttack

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTardajos, Spain

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast