Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Herrera Olivares

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Burgos, Spain

Titular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jul 1568AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Burgos, Spain
23 Jul 1568AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
25 Jul 1568Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
20 Sep 1579DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Herrera Olivares
Bishop Gonzalo Herrera Olivares (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceValladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid

  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 218
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 13, Number 41
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 79, Number 469
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1568, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018