Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Grijalvo y Mínguez, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Caceres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1787BornLos Balbases, Spain
27 Jun 180619.4ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
1810¹22.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
20 Dec 184760.9SelectedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
14 Apr 184861.2ConfirmedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
28 Jan 184962.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
13 Nov 186174.8DiedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Grijalvo y Mínguez
Bishop Manuel Grijalvo y Mínguez O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Caceres

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 165
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 157, Number 861
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Dec 2016