Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Julián Aranguren, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1801BornBarasoain, Spain
8 Dec 182524.8ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
13 Nov 184544.7SelectedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
19 Jan 184644.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
31 Jan 184745.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
18 Apr 186160.1DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for José Julián Aranguren (VIAF: 87644640)
Archbishop José Julián Aranguren O.A.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 251
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 152, Number 828
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Dec 2016