Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Barreiro y Pérez, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1790BornSanta María de Vigo, Spain
1813¹22.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
13 Nov 184555.6SelectedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
19 Jan 184655.8ConfirmedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
20 Dec 184757.7SelectedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
14 Apr 184858.0ConfirmedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
28 Jan 184958.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
17 May 185666.1DiedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Barreiro y Pérez:
Bishop Vicente Barreiro y Pérez O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Segovia

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 418
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 123
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 157, Number 860

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013