Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antón de la Fuente

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Teruel (-Albarracín)

Titular Bishop of Thelepte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1848BornBurgos
30 May 187426.0Ordained PriestPriest of Burgos, Spain
14 Dec 190557.6AppointedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
18 Nov 190658.5Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
3 Nov 193486.5RetiredBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
3 Nov 193486.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thelepte
21 Jan 193687.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antón de la Fuente:
Bishop Juan Antón de la Fuente (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Teruel (-Albarracín)

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 361
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013