Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lucas Conejero de Molina

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1664Born
28 May 171450.2AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
7 Oct 171450.5Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
26 Jun 172460.2AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
22 Mar 172864.0DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Lucas Conejero de Molina
Archbishop Lucas Conejero de Molina (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCáceres

  • a bishop for 13.4 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,359
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 30, Number 83
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 47
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 130, and Page 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018