Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Fernández Temiño

Deceased

Bishop of León, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jul 1546AppointedBishop of León, Spain
10 Oct 1546Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
9 Nov 1556DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Fernández Temiño
Bishop Juan Fernández Temiño (died ) Bishop of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Puebla de Valdivielso, Diocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 10.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 58, Number 321
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 221
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1546, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast