Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Gormaz (Coruña) Velasco, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Popayán, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1507²Born
1 Mar 156457.1AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
15 Oct 156457.7Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
24 Nov 158982.8DiedBishop of Popayán, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agustín Gormaz (Coruña) Velasco (VIAF: 87829248)
Bishop Agustín Gormaz (Coruña) Velasco O.S.A. (born 1507, died ) Bishop of Popayán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoruña del Conde, Archdiocese of Burgos, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Felipe el Real, Church, Madrid
Death PlaceTimiama, Ecuador

  • a bishop for 25.1 years

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 74, Number 439
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 278
  • d: CB, 25 Jul 2014
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018