Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristóbal de Torres, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1573BornBurgos, Spain
8 Jan 163561.0AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
Jul 1635²61.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
8 Jul 165480.5DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal de Torres:
Archbishop Cristóbal de Torres O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 187
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 162, Number 1,018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015