Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Felipe de Perea Magdaleno

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1683Born
171127.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jan 173551.7AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
May 173552.0Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
29 May 174158.0AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
25 Feb 174460.8DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Felipe de Perea Magdaleno
Archbishop Diego Felipe de Perea Magdaleno (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrgaz

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 78, and Page 134
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 54, Number 233
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018