Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de la Peņa, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Quito


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Mar 1564AppointedBishop of Verapaz, Guatemala
15 May 1565AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
18 Oct 1565Ordained BishopBishop of Quito, Ecuador
7 Mar 1583DiedBishop of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Pedro de la Peņa:
Bishop Pedro de la Peņa O.P. (died ) Bishop of Quito

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 76, Number 451
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 330, and Page 280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 28 Nov 2013