Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaspar Cardinal Z˙˝iga y Avellaneda

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Barbara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1507²Born
27 Jun 155043.4AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
21 Oct 155851.8AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
22 Jun 156962.4AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
17 May 157063.3Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 157063.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Barbara
2 Jan 157164.0DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Z˙˝iga y Avellaneda
Gaspar Cardinal Z˙˝iga y Avellaneda (born 1507, died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle of Cßceres, Diocese of Palencia
Death PlaceJaÚn, Diocese of JaÚn
Buried Place (Original)Santa MarÝa de la Antigua chapel, Cathedral, Sevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a cardinal for .6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570
  • b: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 63, Number 355
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 296, and Page 173
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 211
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1550, Number 26*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 27 Oct 2017