Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando de Tricio Arenzana

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1514¹Born
13 Apr 156551.2AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
19 Aug 156551.6Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
13 Jun 157864.4AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
9 Oct 157864.7DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Tricio Arenzana
Bishop Fernando de Tricio Arenzana (born 1514, died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArenzana, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Ordained BishopSalamanca, Diocese of Salamanca
Death PlaceSalamanca, Diocese of Salamanca

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 124, and Page 289
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 76, Number 450
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 30 Oct 2017