Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de San Millán

Deceased

Bishop of León, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1497²Born
1 Jun 154750.4AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
28 Jul 156467.5AppointedBishop of León, Spain
11 Apr 157881.2DiedBishop of León, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de San Millán
Bishop Juan de San Millán (born 1497, died ) Bishop of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarrionuevo, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Death PlaceLeón, Diocese of León

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 60, Number 333
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 321, and Page 222
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 24 Sep 2017