Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego de Covarrubias y Leiva

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1512BornToledo, Spain
24 Apr 155643.7AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
26 Jan 156047.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
28 Apr 156047.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
25 Oct 156452.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Segovia, Spain
6 Sep 157765.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cuenca, Spain
27 Sep 157765.2DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Covarrubias y Leiva:
Archbishop Diego de Covarrubias y Leiva (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 69, Number 401
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 187, and Page 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 296, and Page 174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 28 Nov 2013