Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Avendaño y Paz, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Quito, Ecuador

Note/Previous Titular See: (Antonio de San Miguel)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1520¹Born
155030.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
22 Mar 156444.2AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
9 Feb 156747.1Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
17 Sep 156848.7InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
9 Mar 158868.1AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
10 Oct 159070.7InstalledBishop of Quito, Ecuador
7 Nov 159070.8DiedBishop of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Avendaño y Paz
Bishop Antonio Avendaño y Paz O.F.M. Obs. (born 1520, died ) Bishop of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalamanca, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru
Death PlaceRiobamba

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 78, Number 461
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 174, and Page 280
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast