Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Gutiérrez Montilla

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Nov 1593AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
1594²Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
18 Sep 1598AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
20 Jun 1602DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Gutiérrez Montilla
Bishop Gonzalo Gutiérrez Montilla (died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchdiocese of Burgos

  • a bishop for 8.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 265, and Page 245
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 107, Number 679
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 243
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,594, Number 1*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast