Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Liermo Hermosa

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1522²Born
4 Jun 157452.4AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
8 Jan 158260.0AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
26 Jul 158260.5DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Liermo Hermosa
Archbishop Juan de Liermo Hermosa (born 1522, died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martín de Liermo, Diocese of Burgos

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 85, Number 515
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 245, and Page 173
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018