Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristóbal Vela y Acuña (Tavera)

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Dec 1574AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
1575²Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
27 May 1580AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
21 Nov 1599DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal Vela y Acuña (Tavera)
Archbishop Cristóbal Vela y Acuña (Tavera) (died ) Archbishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvila, Diocese of Ávila
Ordained BishopCathedral, Avila, Diocese of Ávila
Death PlaceBurgos, Archdiocese of Burgos

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 143, and Page 150
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,810
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 86, Number 523
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018