Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José María Álvarez, O.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Shikoku, Japan

Priest of Order of Friars Preachers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1871Born
8 Sep 188615.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Apr 189524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
26 Feb 190432.9AppointedPrefect of Shikoku, Japan
193159.7ResignedPrefect of Shikoku, Japan
26 Oct 193766.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of Shikoku, Japan

MicroData Summary for José María Álvarez (VIAF: 249032120)
Father José María Álvarez O.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Shikoku

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVallejera, Archdiocese of Burgos, Spain
Death PlaceÁvila

  • a priest for 42.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast