Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan VÝctores de Velasco, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644²BornBurgos, Spain
19 Jul 169450.5AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
21 Oct 169450.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
28 Nov 170763.9AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
10 Dec 171369.9DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan VÝctores de Velasco
Bishop Juan VÝctores de Velasco O.S.B. (born 1644, died ) Bishop of Trujillo

  • a bishop for 19.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 258, and Page 393
  • b: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 237, Number 1,468
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1694, Number 42
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,039

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Sep 2016