Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bravo Lasprilla

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1603¹BornBurgos
4 Mar 165249.1AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
Aug 1652³49.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
7 Jun 166057.4AppointedBishop of León, Spain
31 Jul 166259.5AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
17 Aug 166360.6DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bravo Lasprilla:
Bishop Juan Bravo Lasprilla (born 1603, died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 224, and Page 218
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 181, Number 1,129
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015