Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Rodríguez de Fonseca

Deceased

Archbishop of Rossano, Italy

Bishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1451Born
20 Feb 149544.1AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
6 Sep 149948.6AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
4 Nov 150453.8AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
5 Jul 151463.5AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
20 Jun 151968.4AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
12 Nov 152473.8DiedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Juan Rodríguez de Fonseca
Archbishop Juan Rodríguez de Fonseca (born 1451, died ) Archbishop of Rossano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZamora

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 286, and Page 142
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 210, and Page 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast