Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Torres

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jan 1584AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
8 Apr 1584Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
14 Feb 1588DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Torres
Bishop Antonio Torres (died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillavaquerín, Archdiocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopSantos Niños Justo y Pastor, Church, Alcala
Death PlaceAstorga, Diocese of Astorga

  • a bishop for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 121
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 95, Number 597
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1584, Number 3
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Number 7,230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast